Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sintang

Dioecesis Sintangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Agustinus Agus, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pontianak
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 62,103 (23,987 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://keuskupansintang.org/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. A. Yani 8, Sintang 78611, Kalimantan Barat, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0565)21.213
  • Fax: 21.940

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sintang
11 March 1948ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Pontianak Prefecture Apostolic of Sintang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sintang
23 April 1956ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sintang Vicariate Apostolic of Sintang
Diocese of Sintang
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sintang Diocese of Sintang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Sintang
19503,396202,4441.7%1414242308ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Sintang
Diocese of Sintang
196912,925265,0004.9%3202356125367ap1971
198031,508369,0008.5%330339543334ap1981
198884,838499,40117.0%730372,2923435ap1991
1999122,847615,66120.0%2327502,456336836ap2000
2000124,830621,93220.1%2227492,547328236ap2001
2001132,078650,66420.3%2829572,317348336ap2002
2002139,015665,33020.9%3030602,316369036ap2003
2003144,382672,11721.5%3128592,447367536ap2004
2004153,723676,08222.7%2927562,745636036ap2005
2010215,551731,00029.5%3223553,919296336ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 22 May 2012