Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Palladino

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1842BornCampobasso
15 Apr 190158.8AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
21 Apr 190158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
4 Jun 191371.0AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
17 Oct 192179.3DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Palladino:
Bishop Mario Palladino (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 325
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013