Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigio Guido Barbieri, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1836BornSiena
20 Jun 185720.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Mar 186124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jul 190164.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
29 Jul 190164.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
10 Nov 190165.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis
15 Apr 191073.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Remigio Guido Barbieri:
Bishop Remigio Guido Barbieri O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 547
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013