Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Tolu

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1848Born
30 May 187426.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 189951.0AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
21 Dec 189951.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
30 Jan 191465.6DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Tolu (VIAF: 304918495)
Archbishop Salvatore Tolu (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCargeghe, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopMontecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast