Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rafael Cardinal Merry del Val y Zulueta

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1865Born
27 May 188822.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
30 Dec 188823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
10 Mar 189731.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Canada and Newfoundland
21 Oct 189934.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
19 Apr 190034.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
6 May 190034.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
4 Aug 190337.8AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
9 Nov 190338.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 190338.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
12 Nov 190338.0AppointedSecretary of State
12 Jan 191448.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
20 Aug 191448.8CeasedSecretary of State
14 Oct 191449.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
26 Feb 193064.3DiedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

MicroData Summary for Rafael Merry del Val y Zulueta (VIAF: 203808361)
Rafael Cardinal Merry del Val y Zulueta (born , died ) Secretary of Holy Office

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Great Britain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
  • a cardinal for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 411
  • odd/opd: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 14
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 113, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 272, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 352, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 396, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 421, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 530, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 649, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 695, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 718, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,073, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast