Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Facchinetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1608Born
5 Sep 163930.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
6 Sep 163930.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
9 Oct 163931.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
1642²33.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
18 Jan 164233.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1643²34.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
18 May 164334.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
13 Jul 164334.8Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164334.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
2 Aug 165546.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Spoleto, Italy
24 Aug 167162.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
14 Nov 167264.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1679²70.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
6 Feb 167970.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
8 Jan 168071.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
30 Jan 1683³74.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Facchinetti (VIAF: 88214495)
Cesare Cardinal Facchinetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna
Ordained BishopPrincesa Doña Juana, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Original)S. Teresa Chapel, S. Maria della Scala, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 43.3 years
  • a cardinal for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,412
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 312, and Page 321
  • b/c3: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 167, Number 1,045
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 22
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 264
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,063

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast