Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio (Marcello) Cardinal Barberini (Sr.), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1569Born
1592²22.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1596²26.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Oct 162454.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 162454.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
26 Jan 162555.1AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
2 Feb 162555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
11 Dec 162859.0ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
1629²59.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
1633²63.1ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
3 Oct 163363.8AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
13 Dec 163364.0AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
7 Sep 163767.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
26 May 164272.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
11 Sep 164676.8DiedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonio (Marcello) Barberini (Sr.) (VIAF: 72174581)
Antonio (Marcello) Cardinal Barberini (Sr.) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopVatican Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBarberini Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santissima Concezione, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
  • a cardinal for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1624
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 21, and Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 2
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 644, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast