Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giambattista Diquattro

Apostolic Nuncio to Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Giru Mons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1954 Born
24 Aug 198127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ragusa, Italy
2 Apr 200551.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Giru Mons
2 Apr 200551.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Panama
4 Jun 200551.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Giru Mons
21 Nov 200854.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
21 Jan 201762.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to India
21 Jan 201762.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nepal
29 Aug 202066.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Diquattro
Archbishop Giambattista Diquattro (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista, Cathedral, Ragusa, Diocese of Ragusa, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Brazil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,895
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast