Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Girelli

Apostolic Nuncio to India

Titular Archbishop of Capreae

Titular See: (Non-residential pontifical representative for Vietnam)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1953 Born
17 Jun 197825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
13 Apr 200653.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Capreae
13 Apr 200653.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia
17 Jun 200653.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Capreae
10 Oct 200653.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
13 Jan 201157.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Singapore
13 Jan 201157.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
13 Jan 201157.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
13 Jan 201157.8AppointedOfficial to Viêt Nam
16 Jan 201359.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
16 Jan 201359.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
16 Jan 201359.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
13 Sep 201764.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Israel
13 Sep 201764.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
15 Sep 201764.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
13 Mar 202168.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to India

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Girelli (VIAF: 307376721)
Archbishop Leopoldo Girelli (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of India

EventPlace
Birth PlacePredore
Ordained BishopSeminary, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to India.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,167
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Sep 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Mar 2021

Quantcast