Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvano Maria Cardinal Tomasi, C.S.

Permanent Observer Emeritus to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1940 Born
31 May 196524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
27 Jun 198948.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
27 Jun 199655.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cercina
27 Jun 199655.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia
27 Jun 199655.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Eritrea
17 Aug 199655.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cercina
24 Apr 199958.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Acelum
23 Dec 200060.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Djibouti
10 Jun 200362.6AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
13 Feb 201675.3RetiredPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva
28 Nov 202080.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
28 Nov 202080.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jan 202180.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

MicroData Summary for Silvano Maria Tomasi (VIAF: 43108256)
Silvano Maria Cardinal Tomasi C.S. (born ) Permanent Observer Emeritus of United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasoni di Mussolente, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Rocco, Church, Casoni di Mussolente, Diocese of Treviso, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Nunciature to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,780
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2016
  • r: CB, 10 Mar 2016
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cdea: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • i: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast