Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gianfranco Agostino Gardin, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1944 Born
1961²16.7Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Oct 196521.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Mar 197026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1995²50.7AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2001²56.7CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Jul 200662.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
10 Jul 200662.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cissa
26 Aug 200662.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cissa
1 Nov 200763.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Torcello
18 Dec 200965.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Treviso, Italy
7 Feb 201065.8InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy
6 Jul 201975.3RetiredBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Agostino Gardin (VIAF: 315940284)
Archbishop Gianfranco Agostino Gardin O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Polo di Piave, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
Ordained BishopSant’Antonio, Basilica, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Treviso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2006
  • c2+/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,228
  • ab: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2019
  • temp: CB, 9 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast