Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucas Sirkar, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1936Born
20 Apr 196831.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Jun 198447.7AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
22 Sep 198447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India
14 Apr 200063.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Calcutta, India
2 Apr 200265.5SucceededArchbishop of Calcutta, India
23 Feb 201275.4RetiredArchbishop of Calcutta, India
18 Apr 202184.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Calcutta, India

MicroData Summary for Lucas Sirkar
Archbishop Lucas Sirkar S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarisol
Ordained BishopHoly Redeemer, Cathedral, Krishnagar, Diocese of Krishnagar
Death PlaceKrishnagar, Diocese of Krishnagar

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,316
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast