Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Walmesley, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1722Born
28 Sep 173816.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Sep 173917.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jun 175634.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
15 Jun 175634.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
21 Dec 175634.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
11 Jul 176341.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
25 Nov 179775.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Walmesley (VIAF: 57395592)
Bishop Charles Walmesley O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWigan Lane House, Standish, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopEnglish, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceChapel Row, Bath, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph's, Church, Trenchard Street, Bristol, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 352, and Page 454
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast