Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Poynter

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Alia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1762Born
1786²23.6Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
6 Mar 180340.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
6 Mar 180340.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
29 May 180341.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
8 May 181249.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
26 Nov 182765.5DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Poynter (VIAF: 47918155)
Bishop William Poynter (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetersfield, Hampshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceCastle Street, Holborn, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary Moorfields, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 171
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast