Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Gibson

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Achantus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1738Born
1764¹25.9Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 179052.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 179052.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
5 Dec 179052.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achantus
2 Jun 182183.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Gibson (VIAF: 37247044)
Bishop William Gibson (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStonecroft, Hexham, Northumberland, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopLulworth, Castle, East Lulworth, Wareham, Dorset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Death PlaceOld Elvet, City of Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)Ushaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 454
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 31
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast