Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Alphonsus Cardinal Bourne

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1861Born
11 Jun 188423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 189635.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 189635.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
1 May 189635.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
9 Apr 189736.0SucceededBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
11 Sep 190342.4AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
27 Nov 191150.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191150.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1 Jan 193573.7DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Alphonsus Bourne (VIAF: 39370745)
Francis Alphonsus Cardinal Bourne (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth Place10 Larkhall Rise, Clapham, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Church, Clapham, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, Ambrosden Avenue, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Galilee Chapel, St. Edmund's, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
  • a cardinal for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 261, and Page 525
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 38, and Page 39
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 18
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 410, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast