Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henry Edward Cardinal Manning

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1808Born
6 Apr 185142.7Converted
8 Jun 185142.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Westminster, England, Great Britain
15 Jun 185142.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
16 May 186556.8AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 186556.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 187566.6Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 187566.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
14 Jan 189283.4DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Edward Manning (VIAF: 85172959)
Henry Edward Cardinal Manning (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCopped Hall, Totteridge, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Church, Farm Street, Mayfair, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Moorfields, Pro-Cathedral, City of London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 22 Carlisle Place, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cemetery, Kensal Green, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund Crypt Chapel, Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 598, and Page 46
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 147, and Page 148
  • od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 16
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1875
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 410, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast