Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alfonso Santos Villeda, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1936 Born
5 May 196629.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jan 198447.2AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
17 Mar 198447.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
7 Nov 201175.0RetiredBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfonso Santos Villeda
Bishop Luis Alfonso Santos Villeda S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOcotepeque
Ordained BishopSanta Rosa de Copán, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Copán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa de Copán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast