Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Corriveau, P.M.E.

Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1930 Born
1 Jul 195626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
25 Aug 198050.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Choluteca, Honduras
8 Dec 198050.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Choluteca, Honduras
14 Apr 198453.7SucceededBishop of Choluteca, Honduras
17 Dec 200575.4RetiredBishop of Choluteca, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Raúl Corriveau
Bishop Raúl Corriveau P.M.E. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Choluteca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuckland, Canada
Ordained BishopCholuteca, Diocese of Choluteca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Choluteca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast