Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Pedro Sula

Archidioecesis de Sancto Petro Sula



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michael Lenihan, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Angel Garachana Pérez, C.M.F., Bishop Emeritus
  • Rómulo Emiliani Sánchez, C.M.F., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 January 2023
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Honduras
  • Square Kilometers: 3,923 (1,515 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiacatolicasps.com/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 207, 2a Avda. 1 y 2 Calle N.O. 2, San Pedro Sula, Honduras
  • Telephone: 2553-5253

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula
2 February 1916ErectedDiocese of Comayagua Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula (erected)
Diocese of Santa Rosa de Copán (erected)
Diocese of San Pedro Sula
6 July 1963ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula Diocese of San Pedro Sula
3 July 1987Territory LostDiocese of San Pedro Sula (Colón and Gracias a Dios) Diocese of Trujillo (erected)
30 December 2011Territory LostDiocese of San Pedro Sula (Atlántida and Islas de la Bahía) Diocese of La Ceiba (erected)
Archdiocese of San Pedro Sula
26 January 2023ElevatedDiocese of San Pedro Sula Archdiocese of San Pedro Sula

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula
1950183,000260,11470.4%181810,16619195ap1951
Diocese of San Pedro Sula
1966341,920370,10392.4%2313310,361415616ap1967
1968382,479408,03893.7%438429,106466617ap1971
1976569,574654,68287.0%5384313,245476118ap1977
1980687,265738,99793.0%6414714,6221517422ap1981
1990849,355933,35691.0%11344518,874534916ap1991
19991,290,0001,304,18098.9%25386320,476479418ap2000
2000968,5751,383,67970.0%22446614,6754912019ap2001
20011,000,0001,500,00066.7%28608811,3636811618ap2002
20021,000,0001,500,00066.7%23456814,7055212222ap2003
20031,000,0001,500,00066.7%23456814,7055414221ap2004
20041,000,0001,500,00066.7%25446914,4925315123ap2005
20101,158,0001,786,00064.8%40478713,3105418042ap2011
2011900,0001,570,29157.3%33265915,254715532bul30dec2011
2014930,4001,610,45857.8%37337013,2914015033ap2015
20171,030,0941,800,09457.2%52419311,0764815035ap2018
20201,064,0001,861,00057.2%50318113,1353814936ap2021
20221,097,9701,920,47057.2%46317714,2594013336ap2023
Archdiocese of San Pedro Sula
20231,058,9811,852,77257.2%48287613,9333712436ap2024

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of San Pedro Sula
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 56, Page 490, and Page 491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 May 2024