Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Rafael Esposito-Garcia

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Tabla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1974 Born
14 Jun 200834.4Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
19 Dec 202248.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
19 Dec 202248.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabla
21 Feb 202349.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabla

MicroData Summary for Juan Rafael Esposito-Garcia
(VIAF: 22166357538706642548; WikiData: Q115765771)
Bishop Juan Rafael Esposito-Garcia (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis, Diocese of San Luis, Argentina
Ordained PriestNational Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopSt. Matthew the Apostle, Cathedral, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2022
  • ob/mn: CB, 19 Dec 2022
  • c1+/loc: CB, 17 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 May 2023