Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Joseph Swain

Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1943 Born
31 Mar 198339.5Converted
27 May 198844.7Ordained PriestPriest of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
31 Aug 200662.9AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
26 Oct 200663.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
12 Dec 201976.2RetiredBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Swain
Bishop Paul Joseph Swain (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sioux Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewark, NY
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Sioux Falls, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sioux Falls.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,276
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast