Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe-Yves-Marie Duparc

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1857Born
20 Feb 188023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vannes, France
15 Feb 190851.0AppointedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
25 Feb 190851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
10 Mar 190851.0InstalledBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
8 May 194689.2DiedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Adolphe-Yves-Marie Duparc
Bishop Adolphe-Yves-Marie Duparc (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorient

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 142
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 343, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 553, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast