Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent-Marie Favé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

Titular Bishop of Andeda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1902Born
20 Dec 192422.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
22 Jul 192523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
12 Dec 195755.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
12 Dec 195755.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Andeda
24 Feb 195856.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andeda
30 Apr 197775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
18 Apr 199795.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Vincent-Marie Favé (VIAF: 51728515)
Bishop Vincent-Marie Favé (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCléder, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Death PlaceSaint-Pol-de-Léon, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 71.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast