Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard Gabriel Mesguen

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1880Born
25 Jul 190423.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
28 Jul 190524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
7 Dec 193353.0AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
22 Feb 193453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
4 Aug 195675.6DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Édouard Gabriel Mesguen (VIAF: 238834330)
Bishop Édouard Gabriel Mesguen (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlouescat, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Death PlacePoitiers, Diocese of Poitiers
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Pierre, Cathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 15
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast