Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joël-André-Jean-Marie Bellec

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1908Born
20 Dec 193022.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
21 Jul 193123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
2 May 195648.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
20 Jun 195648.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
15 Jun 196052.1AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
2 Sep 197163.3ResignedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
7 Mar 198879.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Joël-André-Jean-Marie Bellec
Bishop Joël-André-Jean-Marie Bellec (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandivisiau, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Death PlaceBrest, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 53
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast