Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolyte Tréhiou

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1880Born
17 Jun 190524.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 192948.3AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
24 Jun 192948.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
2 Jul 192948.6InstalledBishop of Vannes, France
9 Jan 194160.1DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte Tréhiou
Bishop Hippolyte Tréhiou (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTréssignaux

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast