Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Desrochers, C.Ss.R.

Bishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1956 Born
Aug 1983³27.1EnteredMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Aug 198428.2Temporary VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Aug 198731.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Jan 198932.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Dec 201862.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario, Canada
12 Dec 201862.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Melzi
22 Feb 201962.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Melzi
6 May 202063.9AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
3 Jul 202064.1InstalledBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guy Desrochers
Bishop Guy Desrochers C.Ss.R. (born ) Bishop of Pembroke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHull, Archdiocese of Ottawa, Ontario
Ordained BishopSt. Finnan, Cathedral, Alexandria, Diocese of Alexandria-Cornwall, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pembroke.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 13 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 21 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,103
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2020
  • i: CB, 29 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast