Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michel Proulx, O. Praem.

Bishop-Elect of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1962 Born
6 Jun 198320.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
22 Apr 199027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
28 Oct 202361.0AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
25 Jan 202461.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Michel Proulx
Father Michel Proulx O. Praem. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Bathurst in Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Lambert, Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Bathurst in Canada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2023
  • ob: JLB, 4 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 8 Nov 2023