Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pembroke

Dioecesis Pembrokensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michael Brehl, C.Ss.R., Bishop-Elect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 4 May 1898
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ottawa-Cornwall
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 20,000 (7,725 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Pem
  • Official Web Site: http://pembrokediocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 188 Renfrew St., P.O. Box 7, Pembroke, ON K8A 6X1, Canada
  • Telephone: (613)732-7933
  • Fax: 732-1679

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontiac
11 July 1882ErectedDiocese of Ottawa
Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface
Diocese of Trois-Rivières
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontiac (erected)
10 May 1887Metropolitan ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Pontiac (from Québec)
Diocese of Pembroke
4 May 1898ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pontiac Diocese of Pembroke (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
21 September 1908Territory LostDiocese of Pembroke Vicariate Apostolic of Temiskaming (erected)
27 February 1937Territory AddedDiocese of Pembroke (Boundaries adjusted)
Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie (Boundaries adjusted)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pembroke
195052,000102,00051.0%91596541540251ap1951
196654,571117,12146.6%92294580241651ap1967
196854,959118,78446.3%92294584332652ap1971
197653,581110,87648.3%96181144702830152ap1977
198055,498113,18849.0%8115965781928553ap1981
199064,326129,48649.7%7898773931526173ap1991
199965,863131,75250.0%734778558420269ap2000
200065,888131,79550.0%714758787818869ap2001
200165,896131,81250.0%723758787617469ap2002
200265,985131,98750.0%733768687616569ap2003
200365,988131,99550.0%713748917615268ap2004
200465,650132,00049.7%713748878613459ap2005
201373,200147,70049.6%386441,6639915948ap2014
201675,600152,60049.5%4419631,200132114648ap2017
201979,470161,80449.1%4026661,20413299148ap2020
202181,730166,42049.1%4121621,31813227247ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Pembroke
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 472, and Page 473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 11 Jun 2024