Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mervyn Alban Alexander

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1925Born
18 Jul 194823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clifton, England, Great Britain
8 Mar 197246.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
8 Mar 197246.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
25 Apr 197246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinhel
20 Dec 197449.4AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 200175.6RetiredBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
14 Aug 201085.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Mervyn Alban Alexander (VIAF: 134151246505644130058)
Bishop Mervyn Alban Alexander (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHackney, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestLeonine, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopTwelve Apostles, Pro-Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Death PlaceSt. Angela, Convent, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Sts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • c1/loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • d.loc: CL, 25 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast