Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
21 Jul 1963 | Born | ||
6 Jul 1991 | 27.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Clifton, England, Great Britain |
14 Mar 2024 | 60.6 | Appointed | Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain |
8 May 2024 | 60.7 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain |
Father
John Bosco
MacDonald
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Clifton
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Bath, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England |
Ordained Priest | St. John the Evangelist, Church, Bath, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England |
Ordained Bishop | Saints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Clifton.
|
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 23 Mar 2024 |
✠