Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Faro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1676BornFaro, Portugal
16 Jul 170125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Sep 173862.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
5 Oct 173862.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
21 Jul 174165.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for João de Faro:
Bishop João de Faro O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013