Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvestre a Maria Santissima (Santa Maria), O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1745³Born
20 May 176924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
26 Jan 180256.7SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
24 May 180257.0ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
22 Nov 181368.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sylvestre a Maria Santissima (Santa Maria)
Bishop Sylvestre a Maria Santissima (Santa Maria) O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinde, Portugal

  • a priest for 44.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast