Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Azevedo Leal, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note/Previous Titular See: (José a Santa Maria de Jesus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1670BornEvora, Portugal
12 Feb 172150.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
8 Jun 172150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
7 Jun 173665.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for José Azevedo Leal:
Bishop José Azevedo Leal O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015