Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco a São Agostinho, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1647³Born
2 Aug 166416.7ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
23 Nov 167023.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
30 Nov 167023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
24 Sep 170860.8AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
20 Jan 170961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
8 May 171971.5DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco a São Agostinho
Bishop Francisco a São Agostinho T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoures, Portugal
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast