Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo a São Boaventura, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1728BornGuimaraes, Portugal
23 Dec 175224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
26 Dec 175224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1 Sep 178455.7SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
14 Feb 178556.2ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 May 178556.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
29 Apr 179869.4DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo a São Boaventura:
Bishop Cristoforo a São Boaventura O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016