Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victorino do Porto, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1687AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
14 Sep 1687Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
21 Jan 1705DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Victorino do Porto:
Bishop Victorino do Porto O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015