Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Lancaster Spalding

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois, USA

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1840Born
19 Dec 186323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
19 Dec 187636.5AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
1 May 187736.9Ordained BishopBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
14 Oct 190868.3ResignedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
14 Oct 190868.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
25 Aug 191676.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Lancaster Spalding (VIAF: 7620204)
Archbishop John Lancaster Spalding (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Peoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLebanon, KY
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's (Mott St), Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017