Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Hyacinthe Sohier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1818BornDésertines, France
21 May 184223.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Aug 185031.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
27 Aug 185031.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
17 Aug 185132.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
13 Sep 186244.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
3 Sep 187657.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Hyacinthe Sohier:
Bishop Joseph-Hyacinthe Sohier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013