Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Marie-Joseph Allys, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Phacusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1852Born
10 Oct 187523.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
30 Jan 190855.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
30 Jan 190855.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
24 May 190856.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phacusa
20 Jun 193179.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
23 Apr 193684.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Marie-Joseph Allys
Bishop Eugène-Marie-Joseph Allys M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Huê

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaimpont, France

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast