Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonifácio Piccinini, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1929Born
11 Feb 196030.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jun 197546.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 Jun 197546.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turres in Byzacena
31 Aug 197546.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Turres in Byzacena
15 Aug 198152.2SucceededArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
9 Jun 200475.0RetiredArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Nov 202091.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bonifácio Piccinini
Archbishop Bonifácio Piccinini S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuiabá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuiz Alves
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Auxiliadora, Lavrinhas
Death PlaceCuiabá, Archdiocese of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,840
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Nov 2020

Quantcast