Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father João Borges Quintão, C.M. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina)

Priest of Congregation of the Mission


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1871BornItabira
1896²24.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Jun 191341.9AppointedBishop of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
23 Jul 192756.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for João Borges Quintão:
Father João Borges Quintão C.M. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina)

  • a priest for 31.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015