Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Filipak

Deceased

Bishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1920Born
22 Dec 194524.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 196241.1AppointedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
13 May 196241.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
10 Aug 199170.6DiedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Filipak
Bishop Pedro Filipak (born , died ) Bishop of Jacarezinho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanduvas

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast