Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Constantin Koser, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1918BornCuritiba, Brazil
10 May 193921.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 194123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Nov 196547.5AppointedVicar General of Order of Friars Minor
May 1967³49.0AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jun 197961.1ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
19 Dec 200082.6DiedMinister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Constantin Koser: VIAF:77153085
Priest Constantin Koser O.F.M. (born , died ) Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor

  • a priest for 59.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013