Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tumaco

Dioecesis TumacoŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gustavo Girůn Higuita, O.C.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 29 October 1999
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of PopayŠn
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 14,900 (5,755 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado Aereo 307, Calle Nueva Creacion con Calle Popayan, Tumaco [Narino], Colombia
  • Telephone: (7)271.282
  • Fax: 271.278

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco
25 March 1907Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Tumaco Diocese of Santiago del Estero (erected)
21 January 1910Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Tumaco Diocese of Catamarca (erected)
1 May 1927ErectedDiocese of Cali
Diocese of Pasto
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco (erected)
14 November 1952Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco
Vicariate Apostolic of Buenaventura (erected)
5 April 1954Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Tumaco Prefecture Apostolic of Guapi (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tumaco
7 February 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tumaco Vicariate Apostolic of Tumaco
Diocese of Tumaco
29 October 1999ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tumaco Diocese of Tumaco (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco
1950200,000200,000100.0%101020,00010205ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Tumaco
1966164,600165,10099.7%1818364,57218329ap1967
1970164,700165,10099.8%20208,235204610ap1971
1976189,000190,00099.5%181810,50018419ap1977
1980168,500169,60099.4%131312,96113359ap1981
1990207,000213,00097.2%714219,8571143514ap1991
Diocese of Tumaco
1999200,000220,00090.9%1012229,0901162710ap2000
2000198,000220,00090.0%8101811,000132410ap2001
2001200,000225,00088.9%7111811,111142410ap2002
2002215,000250,00086.0%9122110,238142710ap2003
2003210,000250,00084.0%10102010,500172814ap2004
2004210,000250,00084.0%1515307,000222814ap2005
2010246,000278,00088.5%1813317,9351191817ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 31 May 2013