Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isaías Duarte Cancino

Deceased

Archbishop of Cali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1939BornSan Gil
1 Dec 196324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bucaramanga, Colombia
10 Apr 198546.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
10 Apr 198546.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
17 Jun 198546.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
18 Jun 198849.3AppointedBishop of Apartadó, Colombia
19 Aug 199556.5AppointedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
16 Mar 200263.1DiedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Isaías Duarte Cancino:
Archbishop Isaías Duarte Cancino (born , died ) Archbishop of Cali

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Aug 2014