Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Didi Adgum Mangoria

Archbishop of Khartoum, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1959 Born
1975²16.0Converted
10 May 199233.3Ordained PriestPriest of Khartoum, Sudan
29 May 201051.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of El Obeid, Sudan
15 Aug 201051.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of El Obeid, Sudan
15 Aug 201051.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
28 Oct 201354.8SucceededBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
28 Oct 201354.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
15 Aug 201556.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Khartoum, Sudan
9 Dec 201657.9SucceededArchbishop of Khartoum, Sudan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Didi Adgum Mangoria
Archbishop Michael Didi Adgum Mangoria (born ) Archbishop of Khartoum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEngoth

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Khartoum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,773
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2015
  • s: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Apr 2017