Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yunan Tombe Trille Kuku Andali

Bishop of El Obeid, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1964 Born
7 Apr 199127.2Ordained PriestPriest of El Obeid, Sudan
13 Feb 201753.1AppointedBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
23 Apr 201753.3Ordained BishopBishop of El Obeid, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Yunan Tombe Trille Kuku Andali
Bishop Yunan Tombe Trille Kuku Andali (born ) Bishop of El Obeid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTojoro, Diocese of El Obeid
Ordained BishopGrounds of Comboni School, El Obeid, Diocese of El Obeid

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Obeid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017