Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Macram Max Gassis, M.C.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of El Obeid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1938 BornKhartoum
9 Sep 195718.9ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
28 Jun 196425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
4 Oct 198345.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Obeid, Sudan
12 Mar 198849.4AppointedBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
15 May 198849.6Ordained BishopBishop of El Obeid, Sudan
28 Oct 201375.1RetiredBishop of El Obeid, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Macram Max Gassis:
Bishop Macram Max Gassis M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of El Obeid

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Obeid.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,916
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 15 Aug 2015